List of the RBI Governor
RBI Established: 1st April 1935
Head Office: Mumbai
Ownership: Ministry of Finance, Government of India
Governor: Shaktikant Das
Currency: Indian Rupees
List of the RBI Governor
Governors | Tenure | |
1 | Sir Osborne Smith | 01-04-1935 to 30-06-1937 |
2 | Sir James Taylor | 01-07-1937 to 17-02-1943 |
3 | Sir C D Deshmukh | 11-08-1943 to 30-06-1949 |
4 | Sir Benegal Rama Rau | 01-07-1949 to 14-01-1957 |
5 | K. G. Ambegaonkar | 14-01-1957 to 28-02-1957 |
6 | H V R Lengar | 01-03-1957 to 28-02-1962 |
7 | P C Bhattacharya | 01-03-1962 to 30-06-1967 |
8 | L K Jha | 01-07-1967 to 03-05-1970 |
9 | B. N. Adarkar | 04-05-1970 to 15-06-1970 |
10 | S Jagannathan | 16-06-1970 to 19-05-1975 |
11 | N C Sen Gupta | 19-05-1975 to 19-08-1975 |
12 | K R Puri | 20-08-1975 to 02-05-1977 |
13 | M Narasimham | 02-05-1977 to 30-11-1977 |
14 | Dr. I G Patel | 01-12-1977 to 15-09-1982 |
15 | Dr. Manmohan Singh | 16-09-1982 to 14-01-1985 |
16 | A Ghosh | 15-01-1985 to 04-02-1985 |
17 | R N Malhotra | 04-02-1985 to 22-12-1990 |
18 | S Venkitaramanan | 22-12-1990 to 21-12-1992 |
19 | Dr. C Rangarajan | 22-12-1992 to 22-11-1997 |
20 | Dr. Bimal Jalan | 22-11-1997 to 06-09-2003 |
21 | Dr. Y V Reddy | 06-09-2003 to 05-09-2008 |
22 | Dr. D. Subbarao | 05-09-2008 to 04-09-13 (close of business) |
23 | Dr. Raghuram Rajan | 04-09-2013 to 04-09-2016 |
24 | Dr. Urjit R. Patel | 04-09-2016 to 11-12-2018 |
25 | Shri Shaktikanta Das | 12-12-2018 to date |
►1904 ➖ भारतीय विश्वविद्यालय अधिनियम पारित ►1905 ➖ बगाल का विभाजन ►1906 ➖ मस्लिम लीग की स्थापना ►1907 ➖ सरत अधिवेशन, कांग्रेस में फूट ►1909 ...
No comments:
Post a Comment